This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 08:18:49 (UTC).

BRIAN WHITAKER VS SMITRAY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 BRIAN WHITAKER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SMITRAY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0685

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITAKER BRIAN

Defendant

SMITRAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANDY RUSSELL

Defendant Attorney

HALL JUSTIN P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/10/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN P. HALL IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AND DEADLINES

7/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN P. HALL IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION FOR AN ORDER STAYING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AND DEADLINES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AND DEADLINES

7/21/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AND DEADLINES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION)

Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION

7/28/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 01/27/2021

1/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 01/27/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

1/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/12/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/29/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • Hearing07/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • Docketat 5:00 PM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BRIAN WHITAKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Smitray, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Smitray, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BRIAN WHITAKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRIAN WHITAKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRIAN WHITAKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRIAN WHITAKER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITRAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANDY RUSSELL ESQ.