This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2023 at 01:05:31 (UTC).

BRIAN WHITAKER VS DK CONNECTIONS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 BRIAN WHITAKER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against DK CONNECTIONS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH LIPNER and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2024

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH LIPNER

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITAKER BRIAN

Defendant

DK CONNECTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POTTER MARK D.

Defendant Attorney

OKELBERRY NATHAN V.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

8/28/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Order (name extension) Order FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT

8/28/2023: Order (name extension) Order FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/24/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request (name extension) Request FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT

8/24/2023: Request (name extension) Request FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/1/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order RE NOTICE OR ENTRIE CASE) of 07/12/2023

7/12/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order RE NOTICE OR ENTRIE CASE) of 07/12/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order RE NOTICE OR ENTRIE CASE)

7/12/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order RE NOTICE OR ENTRIE CASE)

Notice of Settlement

7/3/2023: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/20/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/16/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

6/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

6/12/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

6/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time to file Responsive Pleading

6/5/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time to file Responsive Pleading

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading

4/28/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Order to Show Cause Re: Failur...)

4/10/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Order to Show Cause Re: Failur...)

Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF AAINA DUGGAL IN RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

3/28/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF AAINA DUGGAL IN RESPONSE TO THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 09/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Brian Whitaker on 01/31/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Brian Whitaker as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketOrder FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT; Signed and Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: DK Connections LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketUpdated -- Order FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT: Filed By: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 08/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/08/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
02/14/2023

DocketAddress for Mark D. Potter (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: DK Connections LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: DK Connections LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: DK Connections LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketClerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less