This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2023 at 02:27:12 (UTC).

BRIAN WHITAKER VS CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 BRIAN WHITAKER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0358

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITAKER BRIAN

Defendant

CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POTTER MARK DEE

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/26/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/26/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/27/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/2/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/7/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

4/7/2023: Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • Hearing06/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference (Notice of Settlement Filed on 4-7-2023 ) scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 04/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department N - Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeldeffective 03/02/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 02/21/2023; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less