This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 05:26:09 (UTC).

BRIAN SUH VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 BRIAN SUH filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2029

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUH BRIAN

Defendants

MESA IMPORTS LLC DBA PUENTE HILLS VOLKSWAGEN A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

ALEGADO JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/28/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/1/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/20/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Answer

12/28/2022: Answer

Answer

12/28/2022: Answer

Notice of Appearance

12/28/2022: Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

12/28/2022: Notice of Appearance

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • Hearing04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Hearing04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department G at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Mesa Imports, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by: Mesa Imports, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Brian Suh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department G - Hon. Salvatore Sirnaeffective 12/09/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Brian Suh (Plaintiff); As to: Mesa Imports, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/01/2022; Service Cost: 83.36; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Salvatore Sirna in Department A Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brian Suh (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Mesa Imports, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brian Suh (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Mesa Imports, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brian Suh (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant); Mesa Imports, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MESA IMPORTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA PUENTE HILLS VOLKSWAGEN is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER