This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2022 at 12:31:53 (UTC).

BRIAN SHIN VS CITY OF TORRANCE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 BRIAN SHIN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF TORRANCE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1030

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIN BRIAN

Defendants

CITY OF TORRANCE

DOES 1 TO 50

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LIVE STEAMERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE BRAD

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/26/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/28/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE

11/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by: Brian Shin (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); Service Date: 11/09/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brian Shin (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LIVE STEAMERS (Defendant); DOES 1 to 50 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brian Shin (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LIVE STEAMERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brian Shin (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant); SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA LIVE STEAMERS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant