This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2020 at 07:42:59 (UTC).

BRIAN SCHULTZ VS RICARDO RUIZ

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 BRIAN SCHULTZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICARDO RUIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4181

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Cross Defendant

SCHULTZ BRIAN

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RUIZ RICARDO

DOES 1 - 20 INCLUSIVE

CAMACHO JESUS

RENTERIA DOE 1 PORFIRIA

SCHULTZ BRIAN

ONTIVEROS ROGER

SHULZ BRIAN

OTIVEROS ROGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SIGELMAN PAUL

SIGELMAN PAUL S. ESQ.

SIGELMAN PAUL S ESQ.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CADENA MEGAN ESQ.

DACEY JENNIFER M.

DACEY JENNIFER MARIE ESQ.

CADENA MEGAN A. ESQ.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

DACEY JENNIFER M.

DACEY JENNIFER MARIE ESQ.

CADENA MEGAN A. ESQ.

SPRIGGS SCOTT B.

SIGELMAN PAUL

SPRIGGS SCOTT BRIAN ESQ.

SIGELMAN PAUL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE WITHDRAWING DISMISSAL

8/11/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE WITHDRAWING DISMISSAL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

9/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Notice of Ruling

5/14/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 04/24/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 04/24/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (BC704181; 18STCV10059; 19STLC...) OF 04/08/2020

4/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES (BC704181; 18STCV10059; 19STLC...) OF 04/08/2020

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

2/19/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RESET PENDING MOTION FOR D...)

11/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RESET PENDING MOTION FOR D...)

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

10/18/2019: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/30/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

12/27/2018: Answer

Minute Order - (Final Status Conference)

10/10/2018: Minute Order - (Final Status Conference)

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/2/2018: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS - CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/8/2018: SUMMONS - CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMLAINT FOR COMPARATIVE INDEMNIT; CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

8/8/2018: CROSS-COMLAINT FOR COMPARATIVE INDEMNIT; CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/8/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/13/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CROSS COMPLAINT APPORTIONMENT OF NEGLIGENCE EQUITABLE INDEMNITY CONTRIBUTION

8/13/2018: CROSS COMPLAINT APPORTIONMENT OF NEGLIGENCE EQUITABLE INDEMNITY CONTRIBUTION

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • Hearing08/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Hearing08/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE); Filed by Brian Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Jesus Camacho (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brian Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice Withdrawing Dismissal); Filed by Brian Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference ((Related to 18STCV10059 and 19STLC07885)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference (Related to 18STCV10059 and 19STLC0...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice Withdrawing Dismissal); Filed by Brian Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Not entered); Filed by Brian Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Brian Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Brian Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Ricardo Ruiz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketSummons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Brian Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet /Addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brian Schultz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704181    Hearing Date: December 12, 2019    Dept: 2

Schultz v. Ruiz

Plaintiff’s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement, Dismissal of Cross-Complaint for Apportionment, Indemnity, and Contribution is GRANTED.

The moving papers are sufficient to meet the moving party's initial burden. The burden of showing bad faith falls on the opposing party. No opposition has been filed. City of Grand Terrace v. Superior Court (1987) 192 Cal.App.3d 1251, 1262; Cal Code Civil Procedure §877.6(d).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC704181    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 2

BC704181 Schultz v. Ruiz

On the court’s own motion, the hearing on the Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement set for hearing on 12/2/19 is continued to 1/7/2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2. The due date for the opposition and reply is based on the original hearing date.

Case Number: BC704181    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 2

Schultz v. Ruiz, et al.

Plaintiff’s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement, Dismissal of Cross-Complaint for Apportionment, Indemnity, and Contribution, filed on 10/18/19, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR for lack of sufficient notice.

The motion should have been served by 10/4/19 to allow for 16 court days of notice, increased by five calendar days for service by mail. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 1005(b). Plaintiff served the motion by mail on 10/18/19, giving only 10 court days of notice.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.