This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2022 at 08:16:11 (UTC).

BRIAN LARKY, AS TRUSTEE TO THE AUDREY LEDERER TRUST, ET AL. VS CLIFTONLARSONALLEN WEALTH ADVISORS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 BRIAN LARKY, AS TRUSTEE TO THE AUDREY LEDERER TRUST filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against CLIFTONLARSONALLEN WEALTH ADVISORS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0036

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARKY AS TRUSTEE TO THE AUDREY WELLS 2013 INSURANCE TRUST BRIAN

BLUE GARDENIA PRODUCTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LARKY AS TRUSTEE TO THE AUDREY LEDERER TRUST BRIAN

BLUE GARDENIA PRODUCTIONS INC.

BRIAN LARKY AS TRUSTEE TO THE AUDREY WELLS 2013 INSURANCE TRUST

BRIAN LARKY AS TRUSTEE TO THE AUDREY LEDERER TRUST

Defendants

KILWEIN AN INDIVIDUAL KURT

ALTMAN AN INDIVIDUAL SHARON

CLIFTONLARSONALLEN WEALTH ADVISORS LLC

KILWEIN KURT

ALTMAN SHARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

SZTAINER TAYLOR D.

JONES CHARLES E.

SALTZ MICHAEL J.

ALCUMBRAC MARTA A.

ALCUMBRAC MARTA

 

Court Documents

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

1/21/2022: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY TAYLOR ...)

2/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY TAYLOR ...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION JOINT EX PARTE TO VACATE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF ELANA R. LEVINE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/13/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION JOINT EX PARTE TO VACATE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF ELANA R. LEVINE IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFFS FOR JOINT EX PA...)

4/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFFS FOR JOINT EX PA...)

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF CHARLES E. JONES

8/2/2021: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF CHARLES E. JONES

Notice of Ruling

8/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY CHARLES...)

8/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE BY ATTY CHARLES...)

Case Management Statement

7/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/29/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/25/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/25/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/25/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 4:30 PM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • Hearing10/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 4:30 PM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15; Final Status Conference ((FSC)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (by Plaintiffs for Joint Ex Parte to Vacate Trial and Continue Pre-Trial Deadlines and Trial Date) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application by Plaintiffs for Joint Ex Pa...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application (- Joint Ex Parte to Vacate Trial); Filed by Brian Larky, as Trustee to The Audrey Lederer Trust (Plaintiff); Brian Larky, as Trustee to the Audrey Wells 2013 Insurance Trust (Plaintiff); Blue Gardenia Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docketat 09:15 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (by Atty Taylor D. Sztainer on behalf of Defts CliftonLarsonAllen LLP Erroneously Sued As CliftonLarsonAllen Wealth Advisors, LLC, Sharon Altman and Kurt Kilwein [424635138069]*-) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Atty Taylor ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Brian Larky, as Trustee to The Audrey Lederer Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Brian Larky, as Trustee to The Audrey Lederer Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Brian Larky, as Trustee to The Audrey Lederer Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Brian Larky, as Trustee to The Audrey Lederer Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Brian Larky, as Trustee to The Audrey Lederer Trust (Plaintiff); Brian Larky, as Trustee to the Audrey Wells 2013 Insurance Trust (Plaintiff); Blue Gardenia Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brian Larky, as Trustee to The Audrey Lederer Trust (Plaintiff); Brian Larky, as Trustee to the Audrey Wells 2013 Insurance Trust (Plaintiff); Blue Gardenia Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brian Larky, as Trustee to The Audrey Lederer Trust (Plaintiff); Brian Larky, as Trustee to the Audrey Wells 2013 Insurance Trust (Plaintiff); Blue Gardenia Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brian Larky, as Trustee to The Audrey Lederer Trust (Plaintiff); Brian Larky, as Trustee to the Audrey Wells 2013 Insurance Trust (Plaintiff); Blue Gardenia Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLIFTONLARSONALLEN WEALTH ADVISORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALTZ MICHAEL JEFFREY