This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 03:28:43 (UTC).

BRIAN KENNEDY VS UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 BRIAN KENNEDY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY, INC , A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO and LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8704

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNEDY BRIAN

Defendants

SCHIFRIN GAGNON & DICKEY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA SGD INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC. A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION

SCHIFRIN GAGNON & DICKEY INC. AKA SGD INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HECK CHRISTOPHER J.

WHITE JOHNNY

Defendant Attorney

BREMER RICHARD DAVID

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

7/7/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES BRIAN KENNEDY

11/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES BRIAN KENNEDY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/16/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/1/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

9/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/10/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2020

9/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2020

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) VS. JUDGE YOLANDA OROZCO

9/1/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) VS. JUDGE YOLANDA OROZCO

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/19/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/29/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • Hearing03/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 11:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reJoint Status Report) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; Filed by Brian Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reJoint Status Report) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketStipulation to Extend Mediation Completion Date; Filed by Brian Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Trial); Filed by Brian Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (Vs. Judge Yolanda Orozco); Filed by United States Liability Insurance Company, Inc., a Pennsylvania corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brian Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brian Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brian Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brian Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brian Kennedy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHIFRIN GAGNON AND DICKEY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREMER RICHARD DAVID