This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2022 at 01:12:00 (UTC).

BRIAN JEWELL VS SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC., A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 BRIAN JEWELL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9571

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEWELL BRIAN

Defendant

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FEELY JOHN CONRAD

FEELY JOHN C.

Defendant Attorney

RUGGERELLO RYAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/18/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

12/15/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/3/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/3/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-LEMON LAW DISCOVERY

6/28/2022: Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-LEMON LAW DISCOVERY

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/28/2022

6/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 06/28/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 06/28/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Order-Lemon Law Discovery; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRIAN JEWELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRIAN JEWELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRIAN JEWELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERELLO RYAN