This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/13/2020 at 09:29:29 (UTC).

BRIAN BEJARANO VS BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 BRIAN BEJARANO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8303

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEJARANO BRIAN

Defendants

ELECTRIC PUSSY CAT LLC

BOULEVARD NIGHTLIFE GROUP LLC

EMPRESA REALTY & CAPITAL LLC

PROJECT LOS ANGELES LLC

BRAIDI FREDDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LACOUR JONATHAN PIERRE

Defendant Attorneys

TUSHINSKY-FOX JACQUES

SPENCER DANIEL D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/22/2020

1/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE; FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/22/2020

Request for Dismissal

1/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/25/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/25/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/25/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/14/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/14/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/14/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: OSC

11/4/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE: OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFEREN...)

11/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFEREN...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE AND OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

10/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE AND OSC RE DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; CASE MANAGEMEN...)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; CASE MANAGEMEN...)

Case Management Statement

10/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer - ANSWER ELECRIC PUSSY CAT, LLC AND FREDDY BRAIDI'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/23/2019: Answer - ANSWER ELECRIC PUSSY CAT, LLC AND FREDDY BRAIDI'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference; Further Status Conference) of 01/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference; Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (re Default Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brian Bejarano (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less