This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 08:40:59 (UTC).

BRIAN BASSETT, , ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 BRIAN BASSETT, , filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III, ELIHU M. BERLE and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3558

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

ELIHU M. BERLE

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADOLFO TYANNA

ANAYA BEATRIZ

AVILA CIANA

BARDEM KYLE

BASSETT BRIAN

BATMAN JENNIFER

BEGA DARRILL C.

BENITEZ CHARISE

BLANOS CINDY L.

BLANOS JERRY

BOOZER LASHAY

BOUDE GABRIELA

BRINSON SHAQUILLA

CADE TYSHON

CAMPBELL-HARLEY SHELLY

CARDENAS RENEE

ECCLESTON PHYLLIS

FANNING JUSTIN

FENN MICHAEL JR.

Defendant

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RODRIGUEZ CHRISTOPHER ROSS

LEMON JOHN CARL

SINGLETON GERALD

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE AND SETTING DATE FOR HEATING

1/11/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE AND SETTING DATE FOR HEATING

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination

12/13/2022: Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

12/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT

12/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/01/2022

12/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/01/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 11/29/2022

11/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 11/29/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

11/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

Notice of Related Case

11/10/2022: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...) OF 11/02/2022

11/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...) OF 11/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...)

11/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (COD...)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/1/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/26/2022

10/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/26/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

10/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Complaint

10/14/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Order Assigning Coordination Motion Judge and Setting Date for Heating; Filed by: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 11:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/26/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination (JCCP5266): As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Submission of Petition for Coordination (JCCP5266): Name Extension: (JCCP5266) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Petition for Coordination; Filed by: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Order Re Initial Status Conference; Filed by: Brian Bassett, (Plaintiff); Tyanna Adolfo, (Plaintiff); Beatriz Anaya, (Plaintiff); Jennifer Batman, (Plaintiff); Jerry Blanos, (Plaintiff); Lashay Boozer, (Plaintiff); Gabriela Boude, (Plaintiff); Leroy Starkloff, (Plaintiff); Shaquilla Brinson, (Plaintiff); Tyshon Cade (Plaintiff); Charise Benitez, (Plaintiff); Shelly Campbell-Harley, (Plaintiff); Renee Cardenas, (Plaintiff); Michael Lamas, (Plaintiff); Phyllis Eccleston, (Plaintiff); Ciana Avila, (Plaintiff); Justin Fanning, (Plaintiff); Ivy Fossett, (Plaintiff); Ivon Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Maria Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Krisell Hester, (Plaintiff); Terry Hester, (Plaintiff); Michael Fenn, Jr. (Plaintiff); Kyle Bardem, (Plaintiff); Brittany Hysom, (Plaintiff); Darrell King, (Plaintiff); David Martinez, (Plaintiff); Luis Mercado, (Plaintiff); Giuseppe Molina, (Plaintiff); Maria Molina-Mercado, (Plaintiff); Terry Moore, (Plaintiff); Lisa Rasberry, (Plaintiff); Janette Ricar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Court Order Re Initial Status Conference: As To Parties changed from Ivy Fossett, (Plaintiff), Jennifer Batman, (Plaintiff), Tyshon Cade (Plaintiff), Ciana Avila, (Plaintiff), Justin Fanning, (Plaintiff), Gabriela Boude, (Plaintiff), Kyle Bardem, (Plaintiff), Southern California Edison (Defendant), Maria Gutierrez, (Plaintiff), Cindy L. Blanos, (Plaintiff), Edison International (Defendant), Shaquilla Brinson, (Plaintiff), Charise Benitez, (Plaintiff), Phyllis Eccleston, (Plaintiff), Krisell Hester, (Plaintiff), Darrill C. Bega, (Plaintiff), Brittany Hysom, (Plaintiff), Brian Bassett, (Plaintiff), Michael Fenn, Jr. (Plaintiff), Renee Cardenas, (Plaintiff), Jerry Blanos, (Plaintiff), Shelly Campbell-Harley, (Plaintiff), Ivon Gutierrez, (Plaintiff), Terry Hester, (Plaintiff), Tyanna Adolfo, (Plaintiff), Lashay Boozer, (Plaintiff), Beatriz Anaya, (Plaintiff) to Edison International (Defendant), Southern California Edison (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Court Order re Case Reassignment; Filed by: Brian Bassett, (Plaintiff); Tyanna Adolfo, (Plaintiff); Beatriz Anaya, (Plaintiff); Jennifer Batman, (Plaintiff); Jerry Blanos, (Plaintiff); Lashay Boozer, (Plaintiff); Gabriela Boude, (Plaintiff); Leroy Starkloff, (Plaintiff); Shaquilla Brinson, (Plaintiff); Tyshon Cade (Plaintiff); Charise Benitez, (Plaintiff); Shelly Campbell-Harley, (Plaintiff); Renee Cardenas, (Plaintiff); Michael Lamas, (Plaintiff); Phyllis Eccleston, (Plaintiff); Ciana Avila, (Plaintiff); Justin Fanning, (Plaintiff); Ivy Fossett, (Plaintiff); Ivon Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Maria Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Krisell Hester, (Plaintiff); Terry Hester, (Plaintiff); Michael Fenn, Jr. (Plaintiff); Kyle Bardem, (Plaintiff); Brittany Hysom, (Plaintiff); Darrell King, (Plaintiff); David Martinez, (Plaintiff); Luis Mercado, (Plaintiff); Giuseppe Molina, (Plaintiff); Maria Molina-Mercado, (Plaintiff); Terry Moore, (Plaintiff); Lisa Rasberry, (Plaintiff); Janette Ricard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 6 - Hon. Elihu M. Berle; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brian Bassett, (Plaintiff); Tyanna Adolfo, (Plaintiff); Beatriz Anaya, (Plaintiff); Jennifer Batman, (Plaintiff); Jerry Blanos, (Plaintiff); Lashay Boozer, (Plaintiff); Gabriela Boude, (Plaintiff); Leroy Starkloff, (Plaintiff); Shaquilla Brinson, (Plaintiff); Tyshon Cade (Plaintiff); Charise Benitez, (Plaintiff); Shelly Campbell-Harley, (Plaintiff); Renee Cardenas, (Plaintiff); Michael Lamas, (Plaintiff); Phyllis Eccleston, (Plaintiff); Ciana Avila, (Plaintiff); Justin Fanning, (Plaintiff); Ivy Fossett, (Plaintiff); Ivon Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Maria Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Krisell Hester, (Plaintiff); Terry Hester, (Plaintiff); Michael Fenn, Jr. (Plaintiff); Kyle Bardem, (Plaintiff); Brittany Hysom, (Plaintiff); Darrell King, (Plaintiff); David Martinez, (Plaintiff); Luis Mercado, (Plaintiff); Giuseppe Molina, (Plaintiff); Maria Molina-Mercado, (Plaintiff); Terry Moore, (Plaintiff); Lisa Rasberry, (Plaintiff); Janette Ricard, (Plaintiff); Glenda Scott, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brian Bassett, (Plaintiff); Tyanna Adolfo, (Plaintiff); Beatriz Anaya, (Plaintiff); Jennifer Batman, (Plaintiff); Jerry Blanos, (Plaintiff); Lashay Boozer, (Plaintiff); Gabriela Boude, (Plaintiff); Leroy Starkloff, (Plaintiff); Shaquilla Brinson, (Plaintiff); Tyshon Cade (Plaintiff); Charise Benitez, (Plaintiff); Shelly Campbell-Harley, (Plaintiff); Renee Cardenas, (Plaintiff); Michael Lamas, (Plaintiff); Phyllis Eccleston, (Plaintiff); Ciana Avila, (Plaintiff); Justin Fanning, (Plaintiff); Ivy Fossett, (Plaintiff); Ivon Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Maria Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Krisell Hester, (Plaintiff); Terry Hester, (Plaintiff); Michael Fenn, Jr. (Plaintiff); Kyle Bardem, (Plaintiff); Brittany Hysom, (Plaintiff); Darrell King, (Plaintiff); David Martinez, (Plaintiff); Luis Mercado, (Plaintiff); Giuseppe Molina, (Plaintiff); Maria Molina-Mercado, (Plaintiff); Terry Moore, (Plaintiff); Lisa Rasberry, (Plaintiff); Janette Ricard, (Plaintiff); Glenda Scott

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brian Bassett, (Plaintiff); Tyanna Adolfo, (Plaintiff); Beatriz Anaya, (Plaintiff); Jennifer Batman, (Plaintiff); Jerry Blanos, (Plaintiff); Lashay Boozer, (Plaintiff); Gabriela Boude, (Plaintiff); Leroy Starkloff, (Plaintiff); Shaquilla Brinson, (Plaintiff); Tyshon Cade (Plaintiff); Charise Benitez, (Plaintiff); Shelly Campbell-Harley, (Plaintiff); Renee Cardenas, (Plaintiff); Michael Lamas, (Plaintiff); Phyllis Eccleston, (Plaintiff); Ciana Avila, (Plaintiff); Justin Fanning, (Plaintiff); Ivy Fossett, (Plaintiff); Ivon Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Maria Gutierrez, (Plaintiff); Krisell Hester, (Plaintiff); Terry Hester, (Plaintiff); Michael Fenn, Jr. (Plaintiff); Kyle Bardem, (Plaintiff); Brittany Hysom, (Plaintiff); Darrell King, (Plaintiff); David Martinez, (Plaintiff); Luis Mercado, (Plaintiff); Giuseppe Molina, (Plaintiff); Maria Molina-Mercado, (Plaintiff); Terry Moore, (Plaintiff); Lisa Rasberry, (Plaintiff); Janette Ricard, (Plaintiff); Gle

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEMON JOHN CARL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Ross Rodriguez