This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2023 at 12:13:16 (UTC).

BRIAM ARBELAEZ, ET AL. VS FCA US, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2023 BRIAM ARBELAEZ, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0573

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARBELAEZ BRIAM

ARBELAEZ INGRE

Defendants

FCA US LLC.

GLENDALE DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

HUGRET SPENCER P

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/22/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/22/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/22/2023: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

3/29/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/30/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

4/24/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); As to: BRIAM ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); INGRE ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: BRIAM ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); INGRE ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); As to: GLENDALE DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/28/2023; Service Cost: 93.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: BRIAM ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); INGRE ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); Service Date: 03/23/2023; Service Cost: 34.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BRIAM ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); INGRE ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); GLENDALE DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BRIAM ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); INGRE ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); GLENDALE DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BRIAM ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); INGRE ARBELAEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); GLENDALE DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David A. Rosen in Department E Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less