This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 15:09:27 (UTC).

BRG SPORTS INC ET AL VS ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 BRG SPORTS INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0183

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALL AMERICAN SPORTS CORPORATION

BRG SPORTS INC.

Defendants

AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY

ALLIANZ UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY

TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

TRANSPORT INSURANCE COMPANY

EMPLOYERS' FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON

PACIFIC EMPLOYERS INSURANCE COMPANY

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION

ONEBEACON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BATESCAREY LLP

CRISPEN R. RANDAL

DUANE MORRIS LLP

DUPLICKI JEFFREY E.

ELENIUS FROST & WALSH

HINKHOUSE WILLIAMS WALSH LLP

KENNEDYS CMK LLP

MURPHY PEARSON BRADLEY &FEENEY

25 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

11/16/2018: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Declaration - Declaration of Jeffrey A. Kiburtz in support of Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig M. Capilla and Allie K. Haling

11/16/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Jeffrey A. Kiburtz in support of Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Craig M. Capilla and Allie K. Haling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/16/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order - Order Granting Application of Craig M. Capilla and Allie K. Haling to Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiffs

11/28/2018: Order - Order Granting Application of Craig M. Capilla and Allie K. Haling to Appear As Counsel Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiffs

Notice - Notice of Payment of Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fees of Matthew Gennaro

1/23/2019: Notice - Notice of Payment of Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fees of Matthew Gennaro

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/5/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address

2/21/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address

Status Conference Statement - Joint Status Conference Statement

2/25/2019: Status Conference Statement - Joint Status Conference Statement

Notice - Notice of Association of Additional Counsel within the same firm

2/26/2019: Notice - Notice of Association of Additional Counsel within the same firm

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

2/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/27/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment) of 02/28/2019

2/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment) of 02/28/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment)

2/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

6/6/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

Notice - DEFENDANTS FIRST STATE INSURANCE COMPANY; NEW ENGLAND REINSURANCE CORPORATION; AND TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

2/10/2020: Notice - DEFENDANTS FIRST STATE INSURANCE COMPANY; NEW ENGLAND REINSURANCE CORPORATION; AND TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING HEARING)

4/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING HEARING)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/20/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

143 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • Hearing06/15/2021 at 2:00 PM in Department 7 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 3:54 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 2:22 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Hearing Date)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
314 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRG Sports, Inc. (Plaintiff); Riddell, Inc. (Plaintiff); All American Sports Corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less