This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 15:55:19 (UTC).

BRETT ULERY, ET AL. VS DAYSI AGUILAR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 BRETT ULERY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAYSI AGUILAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MALCOLM MACKEY and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6502

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MALCOLM MACKEY

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ULERY BRETT

A.U. A MINOR

ULERY STACY

Defendants

DAYSI'S DAYCARE

AGUILAR DAYSI

AGUILAR FAMILY CHILD CARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COX DONNIE RAY ESQ.

LEEHEY PAUL WADE

COX DONNIE R

Defendant Attorney

PROUT SHANEN REID ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

11/16/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RESETTING SPECIAL MOTION TO ST...) OF 09/09/2021

9/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RESETTING SPECIAL MOTION TO ST...) OF 09/09/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RESETTING SPECIAL MOTION TO ST...)

9/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RESETTING SPECIAL MOTION TO ST...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING JANUARY 6, 2021 HEARING AT 2:30 PM IN DEPT 29

1/5/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING JANUARY 6, 2021 HEARING AT 2:30 PM IN DEPT 29

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

1/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

12/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 12/30/2020

12/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 12/30/2020

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE A PORTION OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/28/2020: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE A PORTION OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHANEN R PROUT IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE A PORTION OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/28/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHANEN R PROUT IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE A PORTION OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DAYSI AGUILARS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE A PORTION OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DAYSI AGUILARS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE A PORTION OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO ) DEFENDANT DAYSI AGUILAR'S ) SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE A ) PORTION OF THE FIRST ) AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/22/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO ) DEFENDANT DAYSI AGUILAR'S ) SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE A ) PORTION OF THE FIRST ) AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT), REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES, ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

11/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT), REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES, ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/19/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHANEN PROUT IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

11/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHANEN PROUT IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

11/6/2020: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Daysi Aguilar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 11:13 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Resetting Special Motion to St...) of 09/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Resetting Special Motion to St...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) (RePortions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, Filed by Defendant Daysi Aguilar) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff); Stacy Ulery (Plaintiff); A.U., a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for A.U.); Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff); A.U., a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for A.U.); Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff); Stacy Ulery (Plaintiff); A.U., a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brett Ulery (Plaintiff); Stacy Ulery (Plaintiff); A.U., a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCV26502    Hearing Date: January 06, 2021    Dept: 29

20STCV26502 Ulery v. Aguilar

Court Order Re: Transfer and Reassignment of Complicated Personal Injury (“PI”) Case to An Independent Calendar ("IC") Courtroom from Department 29, a PI Hub Court.

The Court's order Re: Transfer of Complicated Personal Injury Case to an Independent Calendar Court, is posted on the Court's website.

AFTER REVIEW OF THE FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 29 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

At the direction of Department 1, this case is hereby ordered reassigned and transferred to the Central District, Los Angeles, the Honorable Malcolm Mackey, Judge presiding in Department 55 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

Hearing on the above motion and any pending motions or hearings, including trial or status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar Court. (NOTE:  All hearings currently set in Department 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse are taken off calendar subject to being reset and notified by the receiving court Re:  New hearing dates.)

Judicial Assistant is directed to give notice to Plaintiff, who upon receipt of this notice, is ordered to give notice to all parties of record.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROUT SHANEN