This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 10:03:24 (UTC).

BRETT RICHMAN VS JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 BRETT RICHMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5782

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHMAN BRETT

Defendant

JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY DAVID N.

Defendant Attorney

TAKAHASHI BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

6/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

3/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/26/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/16/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Brett Richman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Brett Richman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Brett Richman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brett Richman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brett Richman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brett Richman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brett Richman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAKAHASHI, BRIAN