Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 00:40:42 (UTC).

BRET TACK VS LUXURY FLUSH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 BRET TACK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LUXURY FLUSH, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3894

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TACK BRET

Defendants and Cross Defendants

WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LUXURY FLUSH LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

UNIBAIL-RODAMCO-WESTFIELD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LUXURY FLUSH LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFMAN MARTIN J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CITRON THOMAS HARVEY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/4/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/4/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/19/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Cross-Complaint

11/23/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer - ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/28/2020: Answer - ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Proof of Personal Service

10/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

9/17/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/4/2020: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2023
  • Hearing09/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Hearing03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Hearing02/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LUXURY FLUSH, LLC, a California limited liability Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Bret Tack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Bret Tack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LUXURY FLUSH, LLC, a California limited liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by LUXURY FLUSH, LLC, a California limited liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Bret Tack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer (and Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by LUXURY FLUSH, LLC, a California limited liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Bret Tack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Bret Tack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bret Tack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Bret Tack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bret Tack (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUXURY FLUSH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIBAIL-RODAMCO-WESTFIELD A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTFIELD TOPANGA OWNER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CITRON THOMAS HARVEY