This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2021 at 23:41:48 (UTC).

BRENT TAYLOR SMITH VS JOANA YBARRA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 BRENT TAYLOR SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOANA YBARRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2380

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH BRENT TAYLOR

Defendants

ACAR LEASING LTD.

YBARRA JOANA

YBARRA ROCIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUZ RAQUEL

Defendant Attorney

ASLANIAN ARPIE A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/27/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

9/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/21/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

10/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2024
  • Hearing08/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • Hearing03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES); Filed by Joana Ybarra (Defendant); Rocio Ybarra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Joana Ybarra (Defendant); Rocio Ybarra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brent Taylor Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brent Taylor Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Brent Taylor Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brent Taylor Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brent Taylor Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brent Taylor Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACAR LEASING LTD. AKA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRUZ RAQUEL