This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2020 at 00:34:21 (UTC).

BRENDA VANHOOSIER VS BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 BRENDA VANHOOSIER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1378

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VANHOOSIER BRENDA

Defendants and Respondents

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MANIBOG DARREN A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HIRSCH MICHAEL DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/29/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S, NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF, BRENDA VANHOOSIER'S, JOINDER TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S, NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF, BRENDA VANHOOSIER'S, JOINDER TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

2/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/10/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE ...)

1/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE THE ...)

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

1/22/2020: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Proof of Personal Service

11/15/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/11/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/11/2018: Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Complaint - (AMENDED)

12/11/2018: Complaint - (AMENDED)

Proof of Personal Service

12/31/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/28/2019: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/1/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/8/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

CoverSheet -

4/4/2018: CoverSheet -

Summons -

4/4/2018: Summons -

Complaint -

4/4/2018: Complaint -

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brenda Vanhoosier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNotice (Defendant, Bank of America, N.A.'s, Notice of Plaintiff, Brenda Vanhoosier's, Joinder to Motion to Continue Trial); Filed by Bank of America Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Errata re: Motion to Continue Trial); Filed by Bank of America Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by Bank of America Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For an Order to Continue the Trial date) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Brenda Vanhoosier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bank of America, N.A. [DOE 1] Erroneously Sued As Bank of America Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brenda Vanhoosier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Amended Complaint (1st)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Brenda Vanhoosier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint ((1st)); Filed by Brenda Vanhoosier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brenda Vanhoosier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Brenda Vanhoosier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brenda Vanhoosier (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701378    Hearing Date: February 19, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Defendant has shown good cause for continuing the trial date as set forth in Defendant's papers.  Plaintiff joined in the request.  Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED.  Trial is continued to October 7, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. to September 23, 2020 at 10 a.m. All dates are based on the new trial date. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses and experts of the new trial date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date selected jointly by the parties. The Court presumes the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period.  The parties are to conduct fact and expert discovery diligently and schedule expert depositions sufficiently before October 7, 2020 so that the depositions are completed well in advance of trial.  The parties are to work together to prepare joint trial notebooks pursuant to the instructions in the PI Hub Standing Order and to bring completed notebooks to the FSC on September 23, 2020. No further continuances should be expected.

Moving party is to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.