This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 19:26:21 (UTC).

BRENDA SESSION, ET AL. VS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 BRENDA SESSION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0535

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SESSION BRENDA

SESSION LOWDEAN

SESSION MICAH

Defendants

MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIMES MILTON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/1/2021: Complaint

PI General Order

6/16/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2024
  • Hearing05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brenda Session (Plaintiff); Lowdean Session (Plaintiff); Micah Session (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA is a litigant