This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2019 at 00:28:24 (UTC).

BRENDA MEDINA VS GLADSTONE HIGH SCHOOL ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/21/2018 BRENDA MEDINA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GLADSTONE HIGH SCHOOL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6859

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MEDINA BRENDA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

COVINA CITY OF

GLADSTONE HIGH SCHOOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

YAGHOUBTIL FARID

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

5/21/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS -

5/21/2018: SUMMONS -

Request for Dismissal

10/31/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Brenda Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brenda Medina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where COVINA CITY OF is a litigant