This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 01:43:02 (UTC).

BRENDA GUEVARA VS LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 BRENDA GUEVARA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6868

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUTH ANN KWAN

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUEVARA BRENDA

Defendants

UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF PALMDALE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

UHS OF DELAWARE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF PALMDALE INC.

LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION DBA PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC.

UHS OF DELAWARE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BABAYAN GOURGEN

Defendant Attorney

SCHERR KELSEY ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION BETWEEN PARTIES FOR BINDING ARBIT...)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION BETWEEN PARTIES FOR BINDING ARBIT...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION BETWEEN PARTIES FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/11/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION BETWEEN PARTIES FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS [PROPOSED] ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION BETWEEN PARTIES FOR BINDING ARBIT...) OF 05/11/2021

5/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION BETWEEN PARTIES FOR BINDING ARBIT...) OF 05/11/2021

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/8/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE;)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PROOF OF SERVICE;)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • Hearing10/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE); Filed by Brenda Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 2:31 PM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Stipulation Between Parties for Binding Arbit...) of 05/11/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation Between Parties for Binding Arbit...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION BETWEEN PARTIES FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Lancaster Hospital Corporation (Defendant); Universal Health Services of Palmdale, Inc. (Defendant); UHS of Delaware, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendant Universal Health Services, Inc.) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:40 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Brenda Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brenda Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brenda Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brenda Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brenda Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brenda Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brenda Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF PALMDALE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where UHS OF DELAWARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION DBA PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant