This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2022 at 00:43:02 (UTC).

BRENDA EUNICE GONZALEZ VS MARTINEZ ONTIME PARCEL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 BRENDA EUNICE GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTINEZ ONTIME PARCEL, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1413

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ BRENDA EUNICE

Defendants

MARTINEZ ONTIME PARCEL INC.

WILLIAMS MARCEL HARRISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARIEL FRANK YAGHOOTY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

5/10/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Brenda Eunice Gonzalez on 06/08/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Brenda Eunice Gonzalez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Brenda Eunice Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Martinez Ontime Parcel, Inc. (Defendant); Marcel Harrison Williams (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brenda Eunice Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Martinez Ontime Parcel, Inc. (Defendant); Marcel Harrison Williams (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brenda Eunice Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Martinez Ontime Parcel, Inc. (Defendant); Marcel Harrison Williams (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brenda Eunice Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Martinez Ontime Parcel, Inc. (Defendant); Marcel Harrison Williams (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less