This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 08:45:32 (UTC).

BRENDA CASTRO, ET AL. VS OREMOR OF RIVERSIDE RC LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 BRENDA CASTRO, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against OREMOR OF RIVERSIDE RC LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0917

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CASTRO BRENDA

VACA GARCIA MARIA ANGELICA

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

OREMOR OF RIVERSIDE RC LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RIVERSIDE CHEVROLET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

MAJOR CAMERON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/30/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

9/30/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

11/3/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brenda Castro (Plaintiff); Maria Angelica Vaca Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 10/04/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Brenda Castro (Plaintiff); Maria Angelica Vaca Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: OREMOR OF RIVERSIDE RC LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/11/2022; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Brenda Castro (Plaintiff); Maria Angelica Vaca Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brenda Castro (Plaintiff); Maria Angelica Vaca Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: OREMOR OF RIVERSIDE RC LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brenda Castro (Plaintiff); Maria Angelica Vaca Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: OREMOR OF RIVERSIDE RC LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Brenda Castro (Plaintiff); Maria Angelica Vaca Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: OREMOR OF RIVERSIDE RC LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brenda Castro (Plaintiff); Maria Angelica Vaca Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: OREMOR OF RIVERSIDE RC LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret Miller Bernal in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OREMOR OF RIVERSIDE RC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAJOR CAMERON