This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 08:18:09 (UTC).

BRENDA BON VS PEYTON CRAMER FORD, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 BRENDA BON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PEYTON CRAMER FORD, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0573

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BON BRENDA

Defendants

PEYTON CRAMER FORD A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA AUTONATION FORD TORRANCE

FORD MOTOR COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIKHOV STEVE BORISLAV

MIKHOV STEVE

Defendant Attorney

MORTENSON MICHAEL DONN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Demand for Jury Trial

6/2/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Answer

7/9/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PEYTON CRAMER FORD, a California Corporation (Defendant); FORD MOTOR COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BRENDA BON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BRENDA BON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by BRENDA BON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRENDA BON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRENDA BON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRENDA BON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Peyton Cramer Ford doing business as Autonation Ford Torrance is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKHOV STEVE B