This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 02:29:35 (UTC).

BREANA ROBINS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS JEANNE ALEMAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 BREANA ROBINS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEANNE ALEMAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0139

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARVER AN INDIVIDUAL MEGAN

RHODES SHEMEKA

ROBINS AN INDIVIDUAL BREANA

Defendant

ALEMAN AN INDIVIDUAL JEANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAKMAKIS GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

1/4/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/4/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/3/2022: Complaint

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/5/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BRAJAL

1/5/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BRAJAL

PI General Order

1/12/2022: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/12/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2024
  • Hearing12/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • Hearing07/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2023
  • Hearing06/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Brajal); Filed by BREANA ROBINS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); BRAJAI LEWIS, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); AHIJAI LEWIS,by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by BREANA ROBINS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); BRAJAI LEWIS, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); AHIJAI LEWIS,by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BREANA ROBINS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); BRAJAI LEWIS, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); AHIJAI LEWIS,by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BREANA ROBINS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); BRAJAI LEWIS, by and through GAL (Plaintiff); AHIJAI LEWIS,by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAKMAKIS GEORGE