This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2022 at 04:27:56 (UTC).

BRE HH PROPERTY OWNER LLC VS MARTORELL LAW APC

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 BRE HH PROPERTY OWNER LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARTORELL LAW APC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6060

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BRE HH PROPERTY OWNER LLC

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

MARTORELL LAW APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MONTEE KEVIN P.

MONTEE KEVIN PAUL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

MARTORELL EDUARDO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/2/2020: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 04/11/2022

4/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 04/11/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE COMPLAINT AND FILE REPLACEMENT COMPLAINT NUNC PRO TUNC

4/11/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE COMPLAINT AND FILE REPLACEMENT COMPLAINT NUNC PRO TUNC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

4/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/7/2022: Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/7/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer

2/15/2022: Answer

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

10/26/2021: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

10/26/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Motion

10/26/2021: Notice of Motion

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/26/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FAI...)

5/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FAI...)

Case Management Statement

4/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

4/12/2021: Cross-Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • Hearing10/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Hearing06/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docketat 10:28 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO STRIKE COMPLAINT AND FILE REPLACEMENT COMPLAINT NUNC PRO TUNC); Filed by BRE HH Property Owner LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 04/11/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Martorell Law APC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Martorell Law APC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Martorell Law APC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRE HH Property Owner LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRE HH Property Owner LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRE HH Property Owner LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTORELL LAW APC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRE HH PROPERTY OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTORELL EDUARDO