This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2023 at 15:53:06 (UTC).

BRAYDEN MEDINA MOLINA, A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS, ET AL. VS TARGET CORPORATION, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On March 27, 2023, Brayden Molina Medina, a minor, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Flavio Medina Gallegos; and Teresa Molina Gallegos (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Robert S. Glassman of Panish Shea Boyle Ravilpudi LLP, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Target Corporation, Watermark Security Group, Inc., Brookfield Properties (USA) LLC, and Does 1-50 (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages for alleged negligence. This case was filed in the Los Angeles County Superior Court of the State of California

In the complaint, the plaintiffs alleged, “As a L.A. City Councilmember recently and publicly declared, the streets of Los Angeles ‘are the largest psychiatric ward in the United States.’ Downtown Los Angeles (‘DTLA’), in particular, has become overrun with homelessness and violence. Indeed, it has been reported that residents and workers in DTLA fear for their safety every single day. In the heart of DTLA is one of the area’s busiest and popular shopping destinations called FIGat7th located at Figueroa and 7th Street. Its website states ‘FIGat7th is DTLA’s one- stop shopping, dining, and entertainment destination-home to fashion finds, a collection of unique eateries, and a world-class arts and events program.’”

Plaintiffs further alleged, “One of the largest shops at FIGat7th is retail giant Target (‘Subject Property’). And that is where this tragic and terrifying case took place. Despite knowing that DTLA was seeing an uptick in crime and homelessness, as evidenced, in part, by Target employing an armed security guard to keep the store safe, on the evening of November 15, 2022, a deranged homeless man walked freely into the store, grabbed a butcher knife with a 9-inch blade easily off a shelf and proceeded to brutally attack not just one but two customers before he was belatedly shot and killed by the security guard.”

The plaintiffs also alleged, “Further, despite the homeless man repeatedly confronting his first victim, a 9-year- old boy, and telling him that he was going to‘stab and kill’ him, as reported by LAPD Chief Michael Moore, causing the boy to try to escape, neither the armed security guard nor anyone working at the store came to the boy’s (or his mother’s) rescue before it was too late. Shockingly, even after the homeless man brutally stabbed the boy, causing mass hysteria in the store with customers screaming in fear and running away from him, the man was still able to freely walk around the store wielding a large butcher knife before attacking his second victim, a young woman who was located in a completely different part of the store.”

The plaintiffs then alleged, “Again, neither the armed security guard nor anyone working at the store came to her aid before she too was brutally stabbed. The knives at Target were locked behind a display case—a safety measure that should have already been in place before this tragedy occurred. The young boy who was brutally attacked is Plaintiff Brayden Molina Medina. His mother, Plaintiff Teresa Molina Gallegos, was with him at the store and watched in horror as her son lay on the ground, covered in blood and unable to move from the multiple stab wounds.”

Plaintiffs presented three claims for relief, including claims for alleged negligence, premises liability, and negligent infliction of emotional distress. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested an award for general and special damages with pre-judgement interest. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6764

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GALLEGOS FLAVIO MEDINA

GALLEGOS TERESA MOLINA

MOLINA A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS BRAYDEN MEDINA

Defendants

BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES USA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TARGET CORPORATION A CORPORATION

WATERMARK SECURITY GROUP INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSMAN ROBERT S

 

Court Documents

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

3/28/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/28/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/28/2023: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

3/28/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/28/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/28/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/28/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BRAYDEN

4/4/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR BRAYDEN

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

4/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2025
  • Hearing03/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2024
  • Hearing09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2024
  • Hearing09/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: BRAYDEN MEDINA MOLINA, a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); As to: TARGET CORPORATION, a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 04/10/2023; Service Cost: 195.85; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BRAYDEN MEDINA MOLINA, a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); As to: TARGET CORPORATION, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Brayden; Signed and Filed by: BRAYDEN MEDINA MOLINA, a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); TERESA MOLINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); As to: BRAYDEN MEDINA MOLINA, a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Brayden: Filed By: BRAYDEN MEDINA MOLINA, a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff),TERESA MOLINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff),FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BRAYDEN MEDINA MOLINA, a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); TERESA MOLINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); As to: TARGET CORPORATION, a corporation (Defendant); WATERMARK SECURITY GROUP, INC., a corporation (Defendant); BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES (USA) LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BRAYDEN MEDINA MOLINA, a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); FLAVIO MEDINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); TERESA MOLINA GALLEGOS (Plaintiff); As to: TARGET CORPORATION, a corporation (Defendant); WATERMARK SECURITY GROUP, INC., a corporation (Defendant); BROOKFIELD PROPERTIES (USA) LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less