This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2023 at 10:46:31 (UTC).

BRAVO, JOSE ABARHAM JARAMILLO VS AGUILAR, JEANETTE BERENICE GARCIA

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 BRAVO, JOSE ABARHAM JARAMILLO filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against AGUILAR, JEANETTE BERENICE GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0003

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRAVO JOSE ABARHAM JARAMILLO

Respondent

AGUILAR JEANETTE BERENICE GARCIA

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ARIAS JESUS EDUARDO

Other Attorneys

HERNANDEZ MERLYN NOURE

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

3/22/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

10/12/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Appearances)

10/10/2022: Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 - Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Appearances)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

10/10/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications - Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declarations)

10/10/2022: Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications - Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declarations)

Minute Order

10/10/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

10/10/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Witness List - Amended Witness List

10/4/2022: Witness List - Amended Witness List

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

10/4/2022: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Statement - of Facts - Joint Statement of case

10/3/2022: Statement - of Facts - Joint Statement of case

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

10/3/2022: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Witness List - Witness List

10/3/2022: Witness List - Witness List

Exhibit List - Petitioners Exhibit & Witness List

10/3/2022: Exhibit List - Petitioners Exhibit & Witness List

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

10/3/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Order - After Hearing

9/6/2022: Order - After Hearing

Order - After Hearing

8/30/2022: Order - After Hearing

Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

8/26/2022: Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/22/2023

DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketDeclaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declarations) ); Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketNotice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Notice - Remote Appearance - RA 010 (Appearances) ); Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketProposed Order - Remote Appearance - RA 020 (Proposed Order - Remote Appearance - RA 020 (Appearances) ); Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Comment) ); Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
06/14/2022

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2022

DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Respondent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2022

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities in Support of Expedings Proceedings ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (Petition for Returnof Minor Child to Petitioner ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (Petition For A Warrant In Lieu of A Writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2022

DocketNotice (of Application for The Return of the Minor ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less