This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 00:46:16 (UTC).

BRAVE KID S R L VS NEW MODA LLC

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 a Other - Other Judgment case was filed by BRAVE KID S R L against NEW MODA LLC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8977

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

BRAVE KID S.R.L

BRAVE KID S.R.L.

Defendant and Respondent

NEW MODA LLC

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/23/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT''S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT

5/14/2018: DEFENDANT''S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/5/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/5/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

6/20/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/20/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/4/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Witness List

4/4/2019: Witness List

Exhibit List

4/4/2019: Exhibit List

Declaration

4/4/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

4/11/2019: Minute Order

Request

5/2/2019: Request

Order

5/20/2019: Order

Request for Dismissal

5/22/2019: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT

3/20/2018: COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT

3/20/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT

SUMMONS

3/20/2018: SUMMONS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Brave Kid S.r.l., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Order ((Proposed) Order Granting Request to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to CA Code 664.6); Filed by Brave Kid S.r.l., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Request (to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to CA Code of Civil Procedure 664.6); Filed by Brave Kid S.r.l., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • at 08:37 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 08:37 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Brave Kid S.r.l., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Witness List; Filed by Brave Kid S.r.l., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Declaration (re Trial Documents); Filed by Brave Kid S.r.l., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DEFENDANT''S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Answer; Filed by New Moda, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Brave Kid S.r.l., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

FILED BY FAX

. Bl tvidrh dmnioms o 4est ws Mapabs aBar b s bdeseaw

Antonio Valla, Esq. (SBN 136256) Stefano Abbasciano, Esq. (SBN 277680) Lisa M. Parrish, Esq. (SBN 300499)

Valla & Associates, Inc., P.C. Su gsg' C?Ufl of California

333 Bush Street, Suite 2020 'y of Los Angsles

San Francisco, CA 94104 MAR 20 2018

Telephone: 415.856.9001 Sherr o

Fax: 415.856.9002 By%mmk ; Gomez Deputy

Attorneys for Plaintiff

BRAVE KID S.r.l.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORN IA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES UNLIMITED CIVIL JURISDICTION BC6§897

BRAVE KID S.r.l., an Italian Limited Case Number: | Liability Company,

COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION

Plaintiff OF FOREIGN-COUNTRY MONEY

’ JUDGMENT

VS. NEW MODA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company,

Defendant.

Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 1718(a), Plaintiff BRAVE KID S.r.l. (“BRAVE KID”), an Italian limited liability company, sfies Defendant NEW MODA, LLC (“NEW MODA™), a California limited liability company, and alleges as follows:

JURISDICTION

1. Plaintiff BRAVE KID, a company organized under the laws of Italy, is a citizen

of Italy, and does business in and has its principal place of business in Marostica, Vicenza, Italy.