This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/31/2022 at 04:35:23 (UTC).

BRAR, SONIYA KAUR VS MISHRA, ALOK KUMAR

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 BRAR, SONIYA KAUR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MISHRA, ALOK KUMAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2792

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRAR SONIYA KAUR

Respondent

MISHRA ALOK KUMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HALL TIMOTHY ANDREW

Respondent Attorney

TESI CHRISTINE MCCLANE

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

11/8/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

11/8/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service of Summons

11/10/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Summons

11/8/2021: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

11/8/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/8/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

11/8/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

10/28/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

10/28/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/28/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

10/28/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TESI CHRISTINE MCCLANE