Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 07:11:32 (UTC).

BRANTLEY, NOLA KESIA VS HARRIS, HARRISON YAHDIN

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 BRANTLEY, NOLA KESIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HARRIS, HARRISON YAHDIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1172

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRANTLEY NOLA KESIA

Respondent

HARRIS HARRISON YAHDIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BURDETTE DEBRA J

Respondent Attorney

SHOOK MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/8/2021: Minute Order

Responsive Declaration - To RFO

3/26/2021: Responsive Declaration - To RFO

Proof of Service - Electronic Service

3/26/2021: Proof of Service - Electronic Service

Declaration - Income and Expense

3/29/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

3/29/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Mail - FL-300, FL-150

3/16/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - FL-300, FL-150

Declaration - Income and Expense

2/17/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - Attorney's Fees and Costs

2/17/2021: RFO/MTN - Spousal Support - Attorney's Fees and Costs

Declaration - of Attorney in Support of Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs

2/17/2021: Declaration - of Attorney in Support of Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs

Proof of Service - Mail - FL-120

1/27/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - FL-120

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

1/27/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service of Summons

12/29/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Summons

11/18/2020: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/18/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

11/18/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

11/20/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

11/20/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

11/20/2020: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • Hearing06/09/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department S15 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S15, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (To RFO ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Electronic Service ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (FL-300, FL-150 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (FL-120 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURDETTE DEBRA J