This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 08:54:37 (UTC).

BRANISLAV GOLUZA VS MARK FAUSNER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 BRANISLAV GOLUZA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MARK FAUSNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0301

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOLUZA BRANISLAV

FIELD OF DREAM EQUITY LLC

Defendants

FAUSNER MARK ANDREW AN INDIVIDUAL

FIELD OF DREAM EQUITY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WEDGEWOOD

CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

SMITH LAMONT

HMC ASSETS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARSNESS CHRIS

LOWE STEVEN T

Defendant Attorney

BUBMAN MICHAEL E.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

1/4/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER - STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER, CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

1/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

1/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Notice of Ruling

1/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Request for Dismissal

2/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AND PROPOSED ORDER

2/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AND PROPOSED ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

11/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 10/30/2020

10/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 10/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF INADVERTENT DISCLOS...)

10/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF INADVERTENT DISCLOS...)

Notice of Ruling

10/6/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/25/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/25/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/25/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

9/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

8/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Lis Pendens and Proposed Order); Filed by Branislav Goluza (Plaintiff); Field of Dream Equity LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without prejudice, Entire action); Filed by Branislav Goluza (Plaintiff); Field of Dream Equity LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Branislav Goluza (Plaintiff); Field of Dream Equity LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Order); Filed by Mark Andrew Fausner, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (- Stipulation and Protective Order, Confidential Designation Only); Filed by Mark Andrew Fausner, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Mark Andrew Fausner, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Michael E. Bubman, Counsel for Defendant Mark Fausner in Accordance with CCP Section 430.41); Filed by Mark Andrew Fausner, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Branislav Goluza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Branislav Goluza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Branislav Goluza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Branislav Goluza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)); Filed by Branislav Goluza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEDGEWOOD LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HMC Assets LLC solely and in its capacity as separate Trustee of Ccommunity Development I Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOWE STEVEN TODD