Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 02:04:11 (UTC).

BRANDON ZENZOLA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS MARIKO USAMI, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 BRANDON ZENZOLA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIKO USAMI, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2813

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZENZOLA AN INDIVIDUAL BRANDON

Defendants and Cross Defendants

LYFT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

USAMI AN INDIVIDUAL MARIKO

INFIELD AN INDIVIDUAL KELLY

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

USAMI AN INDIVIDUAL MARIKO

INFIELD AN INDIVIDUAL KELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEHRINGER LANCE C.

Defendant Attorneys

LONG T. PATRICK

FIOLA N. ASIR

MARTINDALE KIERSTEN A

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

4/28/2021: PI General Order

Answer

5/5/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/5/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Cross-Complaint

5/10/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/10/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

5/20/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

5/26/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Hearing10/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • Hearing09/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by MARIKO USAMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MARIKO USAMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by MARIKO USAMI, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KELLY INFIELD, an Individual (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KELLY INFIELD, an Individual (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LYFT, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by KELLY INFIELD, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by BRANDON ZENZOLA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BRANDON ZENZOLA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BRANDON ZENZOLA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by BRANDON ZENZOLA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRANDON ZENZOLA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRANDON ZENZOLA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRANDON ZENZOLA, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINDALE, KIERSTEN A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG T. PATRICK