This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2023 at 00:47:24 (UTC).

BRANDON XAVIER BUENO VS BRYAN KEITH JOHLE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 BRANDON XAVIER BUENO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRYAN KEITH JOHLE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0035

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUENO BRANDON XAVIER

Defendants

ARTEAGA RAUL

JOHLE BRYAN KEITH

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING

QUIKRETE HOLDINGS INC.

ROBERTSONS READY MIX LTD

ROBERTSONS TRANSPORT LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAKKAK DEAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/6/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/6/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/6/2023: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • Hearing03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brandon Xavier Bueno (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Keith Johle (Defendant); Robertsons Transport LTD (Defendant); Raul Arteaga (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brandon Xavier Bueno (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Keith Johle (Defendant); Robertsons Transport LTD (Defendant); Raul Arteaga (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brandon Xavier Bueno (Plaintiff); As to: Bryan Keith Johle (Defendant); Robertsons Transport LTD (Defendant); Raul Arteaga (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less