This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:07:37 (UTC).

BRANDON SCOTT PERRY LOPEZ ET AL VS NICOLE MONIQUE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 BRANDON SCOTT PERRY LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NICOLE MONIQUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3285

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ RILEY SCOTT PERRY

LOPEZ BRANDON SCOTT PERRY

LOPEZ THERESE

Defendants

HERNANDEZ ANTHONY TRUJILLO

HERNANDEZ NICOLE MONIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

AZIZI DAVID ESQ.

DJOUGOURIAN ARTHUR

DJOUGOURIAN ARTHUR ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BARKINSKAYA EUGENIA JENNIE

BARKINSKAYA EUGENIA JENNIE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - No Order

1/30/2019: Stipulation - No Order

Minute Order

1/30/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

1/30/2019: Ex Parte Application

Motion to Compel

2/1/2019: Motion to Compel

Minute Order

6/27/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

6/27/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application

6/27/2019: Ex Parte Application

DEFENDANT NICOLE MONIQUE HERNANDEZ?S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF BRANDON SCOTF PERRY LOPEZ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. CHO

3/9/2018: DEFENDANT NICOLE MONIQUE HERNANDEZ?S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF BRANDON SCOTF PERRY LOPEZ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. CHO

DEFENDANT NICOLE MONIQUE HERNANDEZS MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF THERESE LOPEZ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. CHO

3/9/2018: DEFENDANT NICOLE MONIQUE HERNANDEZS MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF THERESE LOPEZ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. CHO

DEFENDANT NICOLE MONIQUE HERNANDEZS MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF RILEY SCOTT PERRY LOPEZ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. CHO

3/9/2018: DEFENDANT NICOLE MONIQUE HERNANDEZS MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF RILEY SCOTT PERRY LOPEZ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF DANIEL S. CHO

DEFENDANT NICOLE MONIQUE HERNANDEZ'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES: (1) FORM INTERROCATORIES, SET ONE; ECT.

3/9/2018: DEFENDANT NICOLE MONIQUE HERNANDEZ'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES: (1) FORM INTERROCATORIES, SET ONE; ECT.

NON-OPPOSITION DECLARATION OF SIMON MKRTYCHAN IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS AND MOTIONS TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF THERESE LOPEZ

5/7/2018: NON-OPPOSITION DECLARATION OF SIMON MKRTYCHAN IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS AND MOTIONS TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF THERESE LOPEZ

NON-OPPOSITION DECLARATION OF SIMON MKRTYCHAN IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS AND MOTIONS TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF RILEY SCOTT PERRY LOPEZ

5/7/2018: NON-OPPOSITION DECLARATION OF SIMON MKRTYCHAN IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS AND MOTIONS TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF RILEY SCOTT PERRY LOPEZ

NON-OPPOSITION DECLARATION OF SIMON MKRTYCHAN IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL. AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS AND MOTIONS TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF BRANDON SCOTT PERRY LOPEZ

5/7/2018: NON-OPPOSITION DECLARATION OF SIMON MKRTYCHAN IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO COMPEL. AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS AND MOTIONS TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED AS TO PLAINTIFF BRANDON SCOTT PERRY LOPEZ

Minute Order

5/8/2018: Minute Order

ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

8/23/2018: ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

11/29/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/6/2017: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Defendants' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Nicole Monique Hernandez (Defendant); Anthony Trujillo Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial); Filed by Nicole Monique Hernandez (Defendant); Anthony Trujillo Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Brandon Scott Perry Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brandon Scott Perry Lopez (Plaintiff); Riley Scott Perry Lopez (Plaintiff); Therese Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3285    Hearing Date: February 01, 2021    Dept: 29

The unopposed Motion by Defendant, Anthony Trujillo Hernandez, to Deem Requests for Admission, Set 1, Admitted; Request for Sanctions against Plaintiff, Therese Lopez, is GRANTED. The Requests for Admission served by Defendant on Plaintiff on 1/22/20 are deemed admitted. Code Civ. Proc. ; 2033.280(c)

Defendant may move for an order that the genuineness of any documents and the truth of any matters specified in the requests be deemed admitted, as well as for a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010). (” Cal. Code Civ. Proc. ;2033.280(c).

Defense counsel gave Plaintiff an extension of time to respond to the Requests for Admission, Set 1, until 3/4/2020. To date, Plaintiff did not serve responses. Declaration of Joshua W. Miller, ¶ 3. The requests are thus deemed admitted.

The Court imposes monetary sanctions of $245.00 against Plaintiff, Therese Lopez, whose failure to serve responses necessitated the motion. Section 2033.280(c).

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



Case Number: ****3285    Hearing Date: June 24, 2020    Dept: 29

Lopez, et al. v. Monique et al.

Three Motions to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiffs, Brandon Lopez, Therese Lopez, individually and as Guardian ad Litem for Riley Lopez are GRANTED. Counsel has complied with California Rules of Court 3.1362. The order is effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the motion on the Plaintiffs. Until then, counsel remains counsel of record.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARKINSKAYA EUGENIA JENNIE