This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2020 at 06:34:33 (UTC).

BRANDON REED VS ALEXANDRIA COMMERCIAL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 BRANDON REED filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALEXANDRIA COMMERCIAL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6583

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

REED BRANDON

Defendants and Respondents

ALEXANDRIA COMMERCIAL LLC

ALEXANDRIA HOLDINGS LLC

AMERLAND GROUP LLC

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LYNN DAVID ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - Dismissal

2/7/2020: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

2/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Objection - OBJECTION TO COURT'S ORDER FOR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/14/2020: Objection - OBJECTION TO COURT'S ORDER FOR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/5/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULING REGARDING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

12/11/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULING REGARDING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/31/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

11/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

10/31/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/9/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/9/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/9/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

SUMMONS -

5/17/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/17/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketObjection (to Court's Order for Counsel for Plaintiff to Give Notice); Filed by Brandon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RULING REGARDING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL); Filed by Brandon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by David Lynn, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling); Filed by Brandon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Brandon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Brandon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Brandon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brandon Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706583    Hearing Date: November 06, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

David Lynn seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff Brandon Reed, citing an irremediable breakdown of the attorney-client relationship. Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) Counsel’s Motion complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362. However, the Court notes that trial in this matter is currently set for November 18, 2019. The Court continues the trial to February 7, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4B. The Final Status Conference is continued to January 24, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 4B.

The motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the order showing service on Plaintiff. Counsel shall give notice to Plaintiff of the new trial and FSC dates.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.