This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 04:27:48 (UTC).

BRANDON KEITH MACKABEE VS COLOREDGE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 BRANDON KEITH MACKABEE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COLOREDGE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4504

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACKABEE BRANDON KEITH

Defendants

LENCKI KATHYLEEN ELIZABETH

COLOREDGE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDZANT BARRY L.

Defendant Attorneys

RISBROUGH ROBERT CRAIG

HALL ANN C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/4/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/23/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

4/26/2021: Answer

Answer

6/10/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2024
  • Hearing02/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Hearing08/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Hearing07/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Coloredge, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Coloredge, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kathleen Lencki Erroneously Sued As Kathyleen Elizabeth Lencki (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brandon Keith Mackabee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Brandon Keith Mackabee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Brandon Keith Mackabee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brandon Keith Mackabee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brandon Keith Mackabee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brandon Keith Mackabee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brandon Keith Mackabee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLOREDGE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDZANT, BARRY L