This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2019 at 01:49:37 (UTC).

BRANDON ELIJAH PHILLIPS VS VICTOR VAZQUEZ RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 03/28/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by BRANDON ELIJAH PHILLIPS against VICTOR VAZQUEZ RAMIREZ in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9960

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PHILLIPS BRANDON ELIJAH

Respondents and Defendants

RAMIREZ VICTOR VAZQUEZ

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 09/30/2019

9/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 09/30/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

9/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Order - Dismissal

9/30/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

SUMMONS -

3/28/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/28/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 09/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brandon Elijah Phillips (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699960    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 28

Plaintiff's motion to set aside the dismissal is granted pursuant to CCP 473 (b) based upon Plaintiff's counsel's declaration of mistake.