This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2023 at 01:02:26 (UTC).

BRANDON DAIRE VS NORBETTO PEREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 BRANDON DAIRE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NORBETTO PEREZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEIRDRE HILL and DAVID K. REINERT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0819

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEIRDRE HILL

DAVID K. REINERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAIRE BRANDON

Defendants

INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

PEREZ NORBETTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS MANSFIELD

Defendant Attorney

MEGRABYAN ARMINEH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

9/21/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Proof of Personal Service

2/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

2/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION FOR AUTOMATIC 30 DAY EXTENSION

3/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION FOR AUTOMATIC 30 DAY EXTENSION

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/21/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [CCP 430.10(E), 430.30(A)]; DECLARATION

4/24/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [CCP 430.10(E), 430.30(A)]; DECLARATION

Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/24/2023: Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [CCP 435-437]; DECLARATION OF A

4/24/2023: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [CCP 435-437]; DECLARATION OF A

Request for Dismissal

5/18/2023: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Brandon Daire on 03/21/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Brandon Daire as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Brandon Daire (Plaintiff); As to: Norbetto Perez (Defendant); INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Brandon Daire (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 05/18/2023 ; As To Parties changed from INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant), Norbetto Perez (Defendant) to INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant), Norbetto Perez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of FAC, Default, or Responsive Pleading scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [CCP 435-437]; DECLARATION OF ARMINEH MEGRABYAN; Filed by: INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES [CCP 430.10(e), 430.30(a)]; DECLARATION OF ARMINEH MEGRABYAN; Filed by: INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default. scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/09/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default. scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brandon Daire (Plaintiff); As to: Norbetto Perez (Defendant); INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brandon Daire (Plaintiff); As to: Norbetto Perez (Defendant); INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brandon Daire (Plaintiff); As to: Norbetto Perez (Defendant); INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less