This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 04:33:28 (UTC).

BRANDON DAIRE VS NORBETTO PEREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 BRANDON DAIRE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NORBETTO PEREZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID K. REINERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0819

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID K. REINERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAIRE BRANDON

Defendants

INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

PEREZ NORBETTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS MANSFIELD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/14/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/14/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

9/21/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Proof of Personal Service

2/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

2/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION FOR AUTOMATIC 30 DAY EXTENSION

3/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION FOR AUTOMATIC 30 DAY EXTENSION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for 04/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/18/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration for Automatic 30 Day Extension; Filed by: INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/11/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default. scheduled for 02/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to 02/09/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Brandon Daire (Plaintiff); As to: INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant); Service Date: 02/06/2023; Service Cost: 175.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/09/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default. scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/09/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default. scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brandon Daire (Plaintiff); As to: Norbetto Perez (Defendant); INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brandon Daire (Plaintiff); As to: Norbetto Perez (Defendant); INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brandon Daire (Plaintiff); As to: Norbetto Perez (Defendant); INGLEWOOD UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less