This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2023 at 15:12:19 (UTC).

BRANDON ALI VS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 BRANDON ALI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0273

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALI BRANDON

Defendant

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN TODD M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/24/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 2:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/12/2023 at 02:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brandon Ali (Plaintiff); As to: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brandon Ali (Plaintiff); As to: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brandon Ali (Plaintiff); As to: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less