This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 03:51:55 (UTC).

BRANDI THOMPSON VS FOOD 4 LESS;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 BRANDI THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7254

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON BRANDI

Defendants

ALPHA BETA COMPANY

FOOD 4 LESS GM INC.

FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC.

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC.

FOOD 4 LESS;

KODIMER INVESTMENTS LLC

M704 KROGER WEST

PDK CORPORATION

THE KROGER CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/12/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/8/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/2/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2024
  • Hearing10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Brandi Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brandi Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brandi Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Brandi Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M704 KROGER WEST is a litigant

Latest cases where KODIMER INVESTMENTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS GM INC. is a litigant