This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 04:57:13 (UTC).

BRAND SURGICAL INSTITUTE MEDICAL CENTER INC VS VAHANOOSH TA

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 BRAND SURGICAL INSTITUTE MEDICAL CENTER INC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against VAHANOOSH TA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8572

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRAND SUGICAL INSTITUTE MEDICAL CENTER

Defendants

HI MEDIA PRODUCTION INC

TARUISE VAHANOOSH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

TINKERIAN ARMAND ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/16/2018: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT, ETC

8/16/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT, ETC

NOTICE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES

8/16/2018: NOTICE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS

8/16/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS

Minute Order

11/5/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/5/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/5/2018: Unknown

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/21/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

2/21/2019: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/2/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

2/7/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/4/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF LODGING DEFAULT PROVE-UP PACKET

4/30/2018: NOTICE OF LODGING DEFAULT PROVE-UP PACKET

Minute Order

5/8/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/14/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

7/5/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE-UP, ETC

7/5/2018: CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE-UP, ETC

Minute Order

7/13/2018: Minute Order

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (FOR PUBLICATION RE: HI MEDIA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (FOR PUBLICATION RE: VAHANOOSH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Legacy Event Type : OSC-Failure to File Default Judg)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT, ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1) BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT 2) UNJUST ENRICHMENT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Brand Sugical Institute Medical Center, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8572    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 31

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.

On April 21, 2017, Plaintiff Brand Surgical Institute Medical Center, Inc. filed the instant action against Defendants Vahanoosh Taruise; Hi Media Production Inc.; and Does 1 to 100. On August 16, 2018, Plaintiff filed the First Amended Complaint (“FAC”). The FAC asserts causes of action for: 

  1. Breach of Oral Contract;

  2. Unjust Enrichment;

  3. Fraud; and

  4. Violation of Civil Code ; 1709-1710.

On October 3, 2019, default was entered as to Defendants Vahanoosh Taruise and Hi Medial Production Inc. (hereinafter “Defendants”). On November 6, 2019, Does 1 to 100 were dismissed with prejudice.

Plaintiff seeks entry of a default judgment in the amount of $37,539.75 consisting of $29,000.00 in damages, $7,152.85 in interest, and $1,386.90 in costs.

The Court finds that Plaintiff has submitted the requisite documentation and has provided sufficient evidence to support the judgment sought.

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s request for entry of default judgment is GRANTED as requested.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HI MEDIA PRODUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where BRAND SURGICAL INSTITUTE MEDICAL CENTER INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant