This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 05:53:57 (UTC).

BRADLEY WALLACE FYFFE, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 BRADLEY WALLACE FYFFE filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES and WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6254

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FYFFE BRADLEY WALLACE

OSBERG NANCY LEE

OSBERG SCOTT ANDREW

OSBERG DIANE LYNN

LAFRAMBOISE MEGAN LEIGH

HAMEL LEAH

GILLILAND GERALDINE

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OLAN DAVID RAPHAEL

SCHIMMEL ALAN I.

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

7/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

6/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

7/1/2021: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION

5/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

5/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

5/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 05/07/2021

5/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 05/07/2021

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/29/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on January 18, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on September 1, 2021) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on September 1, 2021.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the clai...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on September 1, 2021.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the st...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Submission of Twenty-Eighth Petition for Coordination); Filed by Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order Re Complex Determination); Filed by Bradley Wallace Fyffe (Plaintiff); Megan Leigh Laframboise (Plaintiff); Scott Andrew Osberg (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:43 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 05/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Bradley Wallace Fyffe (Plaintiff); Megan Leigh Laframboise (Plaintiff); Scott Andrew Osberg (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Bradley Wallace Fyffe (Plaintiff); Megan Leigh Laframboise (Plaintiff); Scott Andrew Osberg (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON JOHN CHARLES