Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2019 at 19:57:24 (UTC).

BRADLEY J HERMAN VS KECK HOSPITAL OF USC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 BRADLEY J HERMAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KECK HOSPITAL OF USC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5750

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HERMAN BRADLEY J.

Defendants and Respondents

KAHN BRIAN MEDICAL DOCTOR

KECK HOSPITAL OF USC

COHEN SAJI JACOB MEDICAL DOCTOR

PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER

OVEIAN MARGARITA MEDICAL DOCTOR

CHALISON JOHN MEDICAL DOCTOR

DOES 1 TO 220

SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL CENTER

EMANUAL BENJAMIN MEDICAL DOCTOR

GRITTON M.D. RAYMOND

EMANUEL M.D. BENJAMIN

KAMAL M.D. MAFA

DOES 1-220

KAROTKIN M.D. KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/12/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

3/29/2017: Unknown

1. WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVOR ACTION 2. ELDER ABUSE

3/29/2017: 1. WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVOR ACTION 2. ELDER ABUSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Bradley J. Herman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • 1. WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVOR ACTION 2. ELDER ABUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENCE SAINT JOSEPH MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where KECK HOSPITAL OF USC is a litigant