This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2021 at 03:51:44 (UTC).

BRADLEY GANZ, AS TRUSTEE OF THE GANZ FAMILY TRUST, INDIVIDUALLY, AND FOR THE TRUST, VS KAREN MISRAJE, AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE MISRAJE FAMILY TRUST, INDIVIDUALLY AND FOR THE TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 BRADLEY GANZ, AS TRUSTEE OF THE GANZ FAMILY TRUST, INDIVIDUALLY, AND FOR THE TRUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAREN MISRAJE, AS CO-TRUSTEE OF THE MISRAJE FAMILY TRUST, INDIVIDUALLY AND FOR THE TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8482

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRADLEY GANZ

Defendants

KAREN MISRAJE

STANLEY MISRAJE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DECLERCQ WILLIAM B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/3/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/3/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/23/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

8/23/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

11/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/18/2021

10/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 10/18/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

10/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal After Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by BRADLEY GANZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docketat 12:46 PM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 10/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by BRADLEY GANZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BRADLEY GANZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by BRADLEY GANZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by BRADLEY GANZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECLERCQ WILLIAM