This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2023 at 15:23:56 (UTC).

BRADLEY, DONNY VS BRADLEY, JULIE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 BRADLEY, DONNY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BRADLEY, JULIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STINN, JOSH FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8834

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STINN, JOSH FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BRADLEY DONNY

Respondent

BRADLEY JULIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SALOMON JONI ELLISHIA

Other Attorneys

THOMAS KENDRA

 

Court Documents

Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

12/20/2022: Order - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

Proposed Order - Court Appointed Minor Counsel - Proposed Order - Court Appointed Minor Counsel (Orders)

12/19/2022: Proposed Order - Court Appointed Minor Counsel - Proposed Order - Court Appointed Minor Counsel (Orders)

Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications - Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declarations)

12/19/2022: Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications - Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declarations)

Minute Order

12/13/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/12/2022: Minute Order

Responsive Declaration

11/18/2022: Responsive Declaration

Proof of Service - Mail

11/18/2022: Proof of Service - Mail

Ex Parte - Order

10/11/2022: Ex Parte - Order

Declaration - Declaration

10/10/2022: Declaration - Declaration

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

10/10/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte - Application

10/10/2022: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte - Application

Minute Order

10/10/2022: Minute Order

Ex Parte - Order

10/7/2022: Ex Parte - Order

Minute Order

10/6/2022: Minute Order

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

10/6/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given) - Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte - Application

10/6/2022: Ex Parte - Application - Ex Parte - Application

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

9/19/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA

9/19/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 6 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Ex Parte Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder - Court Appointed Counsel Child/Minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declaration of Counsel for Child Re Qualifications (Declarations) ); Filed by Child

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Court Appointed Minor Counsel (Proposed Order - Court Appointed Minor Counsel (Orders) ); Filed by Child

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 6, Stinn, Josh Freeman, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Stinn, Josh Freeman, Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (Ex Parte - Application ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less