This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 12:47:37 (UTC).

BRAD HANSEN...ET AL VS. KH CONSTRUCTION...ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/03/2017 BRAD HANSEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KH CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1845

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARTER DAYNA

HANSER BRAD

Defendants

UNION REALTY CO.

CENTURY 21 UNION REALTY

KH CONSTRUCTION AN UNKNOWN BUSI. ENTITY

ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC.

GRAVES MITCH

HARRIS KYLE

FIDAN SERVET

WILSON LAMONT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STONE JASON M.

Defendant Attorneys

MEYERS BIANCHI & MC CONNELL

MANNING MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

2/3/2017: Complaint

Summons

2/3/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

2/23/2017: Unknown

Unknown

2/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

3/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

3/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

3/27/2017: Unknown

Answer

4/18/2017: Answer

Unknown

4/27/2017: Unknown

Request for Judicial Notice

4/27/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

Unknown

4/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

4/28/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

6/28/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/6/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

7/20/2017: Unknown

Other -

7/24/2017: Other -

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by BRAD HANSER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Dism. or Judgment) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Dism. or Judgment) of 12/12/2018); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Dism. or Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal(not entire case); Filed by DAYNA, CARTER (Plaintiff); BRAD HANSER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MITCH, GRAVES (Defendant); UNION REALTY CO. (Defendant); CENTURY 21 UNION REALTY (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by SERVET, FIDAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Demurrer; Filed by SERVET, FIDAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by DAYNA, CARTER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by DAYNA, CARTER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by DAYNA, CARTER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by DAYNA, CARTER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DAYNA, CARTER (Plaintiff); BRAD HANSER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNION REALTY CO DBA CENTURY 21 UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE JASON M.