This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2021 at 03:25:20 (UTC).

BOYAMIAN LAW, INC. VS MAX WILD

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 BOYAMIAN LAW, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MAX WILD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7469

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOYAMIAN LAW INC.

Defendants

WILD MAX

WILD MAX AKA HASSAN MOSTOFI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERZLICH ALLAN

 

Court Documents

Motion to Amend Judgment

11/30/2020: Motion to Amend Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)

Order - ORDER AMENDING JUDGMENT TO ADD JUDGMENT DEBTORS BIRTH NAME (PROPOSED)

1/6/2021: Order - ORDER AMENDING JUDGMENT TO ADD JUDGMENT DEBTORS BIRTH NAME (PROPOSED)

Judgment - JUDGMENT AMENDED JUDGMENT

1/6/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT AMENDED JUDGMENT

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/1/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/2/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/2/2017: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION VENUS DECLARATION OF ALLAN HERZLICH

5/2/2017: Declaration - DECLARATION VENUS DECLARATION OF ALLAN HERZLICH

Summons

5/2/2017: Summons

Case Management Statement

8/14/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-08-30 00:00:00

8/30/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-08-30 00:00:00

Case Management Statement

11/16/2017: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/17/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-12-04 00:00:00

12/4/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-12-04 00:00:00

Notice of Ruling

12/7/2017: Notice of Ruling

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/22/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-01-22 00:00:00

1/22/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-01-22 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SUMMARY

2/15/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: SUMMARY

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by ALLAN HERZLICH (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketORDER AMENDING JUDGMENT TO ADD JUDGMENT DEBTOR?S BIRTH NAME; Filed by BOYAMIAN LAW, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketJudgment (Amended Judgment); Filed by BOYAMIAN LAW, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketMotion to Amend Judgment; Filed by BOYAMIAN LAW, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Court Makes Order) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court Makes Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketOrder (RE AFFIDAVIT OF IDENTITY; DENIED FOR INSUFFICIENT EVIDENCE AND UNSIGNED; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by BOYAMIAN LAW, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Status conference is held & cont.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-08-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BOYAMIAN LAW, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketStatement-Case Management (CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF - FOR HRG ON: 8/30/17 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT WE-N. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (VENUS DECLARATION OF ALLAN HERZLICH)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by BOYAMIAN LAW, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7469    Hearing Date: January 05, 2021    Dept: M

“When jurisdiction is, by the Constitution or this Code, or by any other statute, conferred on a Court or judicial officer, all the means necessary to carry it into effect are also given; and in the exercise of this jurisdiction, if the course of proceeding be not specifically pointed out by this Code or the statute, any suitable process or mode of proceeding may be adopted which may appear most conformable to the spirit of this Code.” (Code Civ. Proc., ; 187.)

“Under Code of Civil Procedure section 187, the court had the authority to amend the judgment to add a judgment debtor. (NEC Electronics Inc. v. Hurt (1989) 208 Cal.App.3d 772, 778, 256 Cal.Rptr. 441.) . . . The decision to grant an amendment in such circumstances lies in the sound discretion of the trial court.” (Carr v. Barnabey's Hotel Corp. In addition:

[n]o statute of limitations applies to a section 187 motion to amend a judgment to add a judgment debtor. To the contrary, the motion may be made “ ‘ “ ‘at any time so that the judgment will properly designate the real defendants.’ ” ’ [Citation.]” (Wells Fargo, supra, 227 Cal.App.4th at p. 7, 173 Cal.Rptr.3d 113.) “Simply put, section 187 recognizes ‘the inherent authority of a court to make its records speak the truth.’ [Citation.]” (Greenspan, supra, 191 Cal.App.4th at p. 509, 121 Cal.Rptr.3d 118, quoting Mirabito v. San Francisco Dairy Co. (1935) 8 Cal.App.2d 54, 57, 47 P.2d 530.

(Highland Springs Conference & Training Center v. City of Banning (2016) 244 Cal.App.4th 267, 287.)

ANALYSIS

On November 30, 2020, Plaintiff Boyamian Law, Inc. filed a motion to amend the judgment. Plaintiff seeks to amend the judgment to include the judgment debtor’s birth name.

On February 15, 2018, the Court entered default judgment against Defendant Max Wild. Plaintiff argues that Max Wild is Defendant’s stage name and that his birth name is Hassan Mostofi. Plaintiff previously attempted to amend the judgment on an ex parte basis, and the Court denied the motion on March 15, 2018, finding that there was insufficient evidence provided in support of the application. (See 03/15/2018 Minute Order.)

“[A]mending a judgment to add an alter ego does not add a new defendant but instead inserts the correct name of the real defendant. (Misik v. D'Arco (Aug. 9, 2011) [citing Hall, Goodhue, Haisley & Barker, Inc. v. Marconi Conf. Center Bd. (1996) 41 Cal.App.4th 1551, 1555; NEC Electronics, Inc. v. Hurt, supra, (See Boyamian Decl. ¶¶ 2 -4.) The Court finds that Plaintiff/Judgement Creditor has provided sufficient evidence to show that Max Wild is Hassan Mostofi. Therefore, the motion to amend the judgment is GRANTED.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZLICH ALLAN