This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 13:58:08 (UTC).

BOYADJIAN, LENA WAHAN VS BOYADJIAN, VIKEN NOUBAR

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 BOYADJIAN, LENA WAHAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOYADJIAN, VIKEN NOUBAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6581

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOYADJIAN LENA WAHAN

Respondent

BOYADJIAN VIKEN NOUBAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVITIAN ANNA AIDA

Respondent Attorney

ELKADDOUM ROCKY

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/15/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

6/15/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons - Summons

6/15/2022: Summons - Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/20/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/19/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Electronic)

7/18/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Electronic)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

7/18/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

10/7/2022: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Exhibit List - Exhibits to RFO

10/7/2022: Exhibit List - Exhibits to RFO

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

10/7/2022: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Memorandum - Points and Authorities

Declaration - Declaration of Petitioner Lena Wahan Boyadjian

10/7/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Petitioner Lena Wahan Boyadjian

RFO/MTN - Family Law - RFO FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT, ATTORNEY FEES, AND SALE OF FAMILY HOME

10/7/2022: RFO/MTN - Family Law - RFO FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT, ATTORNEY FEES, AND SALE OF FAMILY HOME

Declaration - Declaration of Attorney Anna Davitian

10/7/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Attorney Anna Davitian

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

10/27/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

11/14/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

Miscellaneous - Petitioner's Tax Returns in Support of Request for Order

11/14/2022: Miscellaneous - Petitioner's Tax Returns in Support of Request for Order

Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

11/15/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - Proof of Service - Mail

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • Hearing12/14/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department 6 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; RFO - Family Law

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service - Mail ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Proof of Service - Mail ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Petitioner's Tax Returns in Support of Request for Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Family Law (RFO FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT, ATTORNEY FEES, AND SALE OF FAMILY HOME ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Attorney Anna Davitian ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Petitioner Lena Wahan Boyadjian ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (Memorandum - Points and Authorities ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketExhibit List (Exhibits to RFO ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service (Electronic) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELKADDOUM ROCKY